BEXLEY BEAVERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Bexley Beavers provides an exclusive weekly swimming session for people with disabilities, their carers and their immediate family members, supervised by trained volunteer lifeguards, to enjoy the health and social benefits that swimming provides. It provides an opportunity for all of the family to enjoy some time together in an activity that they would not normally have access to.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Bexley
Governance
- 03 April 2014: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CELINE HELENA OLSZOWKA | Chair | 05 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
DAVID JOHN SADLER | Trustee | 05 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
CHRIS DEERING | Trustee | 05 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
NORMAN BRIAN LEACH | Trustee | 05 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
EILEEN ELIZABETH CASEY | Trustee | 05 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL DAVID SADLER | Trustee | 05 January 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.07k | £8.61k | £3.60k | £11.50k | £13.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.44k | £3.60k | £3.55k | £10.70k | £9.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 31 OCT 2013 AS AMENDED ON 07/03/2014
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF NEED FOR DISABLED PEOPLE BY PROVIDING, TEACHING AND ENCOURAGING SWIMMING AND PROVIDING OTHER ACTIVITIES TO BUILD THEIR CONFIDENCE AND HELP THEM PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
19 ANNESLEY ROAD
LONDON
SE3 0JX
- Phone:
- 02033938305
- Email:
- info@bexleybeavers.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window