GRAPES HILL COMMUNITY GARDEN GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing local residents opportunities to learn or share horticultural skills. Design allows full use by wheelchair users. Free events enhance social cohesion by providing fun, education and entertainment for all age groups. Events include nature days, community lunches, celebrations of culture and free workshops. Anyone can visit the garden which is open every day of the year free of charge.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Norfolk
Governance
- 10 April 2014: Standard registration
- GHCGG (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Bearman | Chair | 12 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
Clare Elizabeth Nubel | Trustee | 07 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Patrick Stephen Goodall | Trustee | 08 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Wyn Hurst | Trustee | 06 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
FRANCES LOUISE ELLINGTON BA HONS | Trustee | 12 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr Peter Ellington | Trustee | 12 November 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.76k | £14.24k | £14.98k | £17.36k | £3.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.68k | £12.18k | £18.90k | £19.61k | £20.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 12 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 04 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 DEC 2008 AS AMENDED ON 06/03/2014
Charitable objects
1. TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION BY PROVIDING AN AREA FOR USE AS A COMMUNITY GARDEN AND OTHER ACTIVITIES FOR INDIVIDUALS IN GRAPES HILL AND THE SURROUNDS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS 2. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT PARTICULARLY BY PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES FOR LEARNING ABOUT HORTICULTURE IN AND AROUND THE COMMUNITY GARDEN
Contact information
- Address:
-
17 CONSTABLE ROAD
NORWICH
NR4 6RW
- Phone:
- 01603504495
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window