IN2OUT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Primary aim of In2out is to reduce re-offending by bringing positive change into the lives of young people, aged 15-21, leaving custody. In2out aims to provide purpose to young offender's lives, bringing greater security into their lives and family impacting our communities in a positive manner.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £30,000 from 1 government contract(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 11 December 2013: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TERRY WILCOX | Chair | 20 June 2017 |
|
|||||
Trefor Giles | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kerry Bell-Saunders | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter Gibson | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael John Davies | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|||||
Rev Andrew Georgiou | Trustee | 19 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Tony Fennerty | Trustee | 01 November 2017 |
|
|||||
Joanna Clarkson | Trustee | 20 June 2017 |
|
|||||
LIS WILCOX | Trustee | 20 June 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £225.53k | £335.60k | £349.07k | £227.06k | £335.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £216.35k | £250.27k | £259.19k | £294.70k | £334.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £44.88k | £54.06k | £55.00k | £30.00k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £27.65k | N/A | £55.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 15 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 09 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 07 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 20 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 11 Dec 2013 as amended on 13 Oct 2023
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF AND REHABILITATION OF PERSONS WHO ARE PRESENTLY OR HAVE BEEN OR ARE AT RISK OF BEING DETAINED IN ANY PENAL OR CORRECTIONAL ESTABLISHMENT IN THE UNITED KINGDOM WITH A VIEW TO HELPING THEM BETTER REINTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY AND PREVENTING RE-OFFENDING BY: A) RELIEVING THEIR POVERTY AND CHARITABLE NEED; B) DEVELOPING THEIR CAPACITIES TO IDENTIFY AND MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS; C) HELPING TO FIND ACCOMMODATION FOR THEM AND THEIR DEPENDENTS; D) DEVELOPING AND DELIVERING PROGRAMMES INTENDED TO CHANGE THEIR BEHAVIOUR AND ATTITUDES; E) DEVELOPING AND DELIVERING PROGRAMMES THAT WILL ENCOURAGE A MEANINGFUL USE OF THEIR TIME. THE ORGANISATION SHALL APPLY CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES THROUGH THE WORK SO CARRIED OUT
Contact information
- Address:
-
H M Young Offenders Institution
York Road
WETHERBY
LS22 5ED
- Phone:
- 07775720330
- Email:
- terry.wilcox@in2out.org.uk
- Website:
-
In2Out.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window