Accounts and annual returns IDEA INVESTMENT

Charity number: 1155636
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 April 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 01 April 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 01 April 2017 20 June 2018 139 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2016 28 January 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2016 Not Required