The Brooking

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
In accordance with its constitution, the objects and activities of the charity is to advance the education of the public and professions in the field of architecture through The Brooking and to develop, preserve and maintain The Brooking for educational and museum purposes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 16 January 2014: CIO registration
- 24 February 2015: Funds received from 294368 THE BROOKING ARCHITECTURAL MUSEUM TRUST
- Brooking Museum of Architectural Detail (Previous name)
- THE BROOKING NATIONAL ARCHITECTURAL MUSEUM (Previous name)
- THE BROOKING NATIONAL ARCHITECTURAL MUSEUM TRUST (Previous name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Peter Charles Nicholas Stewart | Chair | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Margaret Gibbs | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julian McIntosh | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ingrid Doris Petit | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Isabelle Taylor | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emma Denness | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Esther Lily Crowther | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Stuart John Hay | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
ROSEMARY HURTLEY | Trustee | 31 January 2021 |
|
|||||
Colin O'Sullivan | Trustee | 16 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Hockley | Trustee | 09 September 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.85k | £182.75k | £2.37m | £7.52k | £10.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.25k | £13.59k | £111.24k | £203.89k | £114.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £2.36m | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £6.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £37 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £150 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £111.24k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 01 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 01 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 22 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 22 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 14 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 14 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 16 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 16 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 15 January 2021 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 15 January 2021 | 17 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION REGISTERED 16 JAN 2014 AMENDED ON 20/12/2014 as amended on 22 Nov 2018 as amended on 12 Jul 2022 as amended on 12 Jul 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE ORGANISATION ARE TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND PROFESSIONS IN THE FIELD OF ARCHITECTURE THROUGH THE BROOKING COLLECTION AND TO DEVELOP, PRESERVE AND MAINTAIN THE BROOKING COLLECTION FOR EDUCATIONAL AND MUSEUM PURPOSES.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Brooking
Andover Road
WHITCHURCH
Hampshire
RG28 7RL
- Phone:
- 01256229128
- Email:
- enquire@thebrooking.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window