DOWNEND FOLK HOUSE ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The establishment and operating of a community centre, and maintaining, managing or co-operating with any statutory authority in the maintenance and management of such a centre for activities promoted by the charity in furtherance of the charities objectives:
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Bristol City
- South Gloucestershire
Governance
- 29 May 2014: CIO registration
- 22 July 2014: Funds received from 269145 THE DOWNEND FOLK HOUSE ASSOCIATION
- DFHA (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
EILEEN BENDREY | Chair | 02 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
JANET BIGGIN | Trustee | 06 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
JULIA KENNETT | Trustee | 06 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
BRUCE GIBBS | Trustee | 05 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
MEL BROWN | Trustee | 02 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
MERLE HOSKING | Trustee | 02 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Clements | Trustee | 06 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE BILELLA | Trustee | 03 March 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £128.00k | £55.00k | £91.00k | £116.00k | £116.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £141.00k | £66.00k | £99.00k | £157.00k | £124.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £17.00k | £23.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 08 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 08 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 21 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 21 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 23 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 23 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 29 May 2014
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF DOWNEND AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTIVES BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER: TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN OR MANAGE OR COOPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTIVES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Downend Folk House Association
Lincombe Barn
Overndale Road
BRISTOL
BS16 2RW
- Phone:
- 01179562367
- Email:
- dfha_zoe@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window