YOUTH DREAM (SELSEY) LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
?To act as a resource for young people up to the age of 25? living in Selsey, West Sussex? by providing advice and assistance and organising programmes of physical, educational and other activities as a means of advancing in life and helping young people by developing their skills, capacities and capabilities to enable them to participate in society.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £19,300 from 4 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- West Sussex
Governance
- 28 February 2014: Standard registration
- YOUTH DREAM (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR MIKE NICHOLLS | Chair | 07 November 2013 |
|
|||||
Katy Gowns | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Molly Gowns | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alison Goodhram | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kate Grant | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jacqui Manuel | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Chris Tate | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Greenwood-Hewitt | Trustee | 24 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anna Gaymer | Trustee | 01 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
John Keith Fletcher | Trustee | 14 March 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £140.87k | £135.83k | £222.66k | £187.17k | £203.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £123.89k | £123.89k | £183.23k | £201.10k | £195.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £36.70k | £5.00k | £20.24k | N/A | £19.30k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 02 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 14 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 04 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 04 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 29 OCT 2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 17/02/2014
Charitable objects
TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO THE AGE OF 25 LIVING IN SELSEY, WEST SUSSEX BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF PHYSICAL, EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AS A MEANS OF: (A) ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; (B) ADVANCING EDUCATION; (D) PROVIDING RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITY IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR PEOPLE LIVING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Phoenix Accounting Services
3 Selsey Business Centre
The Bridleway
Selsey
CHICHESTER
West Sus
- Phone:
- 01243201616
- Email:
- TREASURER@YOUTHDREAM.CO.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window