PLATANOS FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Educational promotion
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Lambeth
Governance
- 29 January 2014: CIO registration
- PLATANOS COMMUNITY FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HUMROY WHYTE | Trustee | 22 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
AKIN ALABI | Trustee | 22 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
AGATHA DOMINGO | Trustee | 22 November 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £770 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £500 | £500 | £500 | £500 | £500 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 30 December 2024 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 30 December 2024 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 27 March 2024 | 90 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 27 March 2024 | 90 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 23 January 2023 | 26 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 23 January 2023 | 26 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 15 September 2022 | 261 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 15 September 2022 | 261 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 08 March 2021 | 69 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 08 March 2021 | 69 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 29 Jan 2014
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF PEOPLE, AND IN PARTICULAR CURRENT AND PAST PUPILS OF PLATANOS COLLEGE AND THEIR FAMILIES, IN LAMBETH, AND NEIGHBOURING BOROUGHS AS APPROPRIATE, IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT, INCLUDING BY: 1. AWARDING TO SUCH PERSONS SCHOLARSHIPS, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES OR GRANTS TENABLE AT ANY UNIVERSITY, COLLEGE OR INSTITUTION OF HIGHER OR FURTHER EDUCATION; 2. PROVIDING THEIR EDUCATION (INCLUDING THE STUDY OF MUSIC OR OTHER ARTS), TO UNDERTAKE TRAVEL IN FURTHERANCE OF THAT EDUCATION OR TO PREPARE FOR ENTRY TO ANY OCCUPATION, TRADE OR PROFESSION ON LEAVING ANY EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT; 3. PROMOTING LEARNING BY PEOPLE NO LONGER IN FULL TIME EMPLOYMENT THROUGH THE CONTINUED DEVELOPMENT OF THEIR INDIVIDUAL CAPABILITIES, COMPETENCIES, SKILLS AND UNDERSTANDING IN SUBJECTS OF EDUCATIONAL VALUE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Platanos College
Stockwell Park Road
Stockwell
LONDON
SW9 0AL
- Phone:
- 02077336156
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window