Financial history CEDARS PARK PTA

Charity number: 1155622
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £2.92k £940 £2.22k £5.74k £6.29k
Total expenditure £3.51k £977 £3.73k £6.08k £5.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A