THE FRIENDS OF WEST PARK (WOLVERHAMPTON)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
West Park, Wolverhampton. The charities Objects: 1) To provide or assist in the provision of recreational facilities 2) To promote the conservation and protection of the physical and natural environment 3) To support the advancement of education to the general public, in particular, the study of environmental education, science, natural history, and geography of West Park and the surrounding area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2018
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 31 December 2013: CIO registration
- THE FRIENDS OF WEST PARK (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Fiona Warley | Chair | 23 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rosalind Moger | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jo Harper | Trustee | 13 October 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.00k | £732 | £341 | £850 | £500 | |
|
Total expenditure | £132 | £567 | £177 | £197 | £200 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 200 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 200 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 566 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 566 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 931 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 931 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1296 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1296 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1661 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1661 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 31 Dec 2013
Charitable objects
3.THE CHARITY IS ESTABLISHED FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT FOR THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS WITHIN WEST PARK IN THE CITY OF WOLVERHAMPTON:- 1)TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; 2)TO PROMOTE THE CONSERVATION AND PROTECTION OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT OF WEST PARK, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY TO PROTECT THE VICTORIAN HERITAGE OF THE PARK INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE BANDSTAND AND CONSERVATORY; AND 3)TO SUPPORT THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION TO THE GENERAL PUBLIC, IN PARTICULAR, BUT WITHOUT LIMITING THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING, THE STUDY OF ENVIRONMENTAL EDUCATION, SCIENCE, NATURAL HISTORY, AND GEOGRAPHY OF WEST PARK AND THE SURROUNDING AREA.
Area of benefit
WITHIN WEST PARK IN THE CITY OF WOLVERHAMPTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
159 Tettenhall Road
WOLVERHAMPTON
WV6 0BZ
- Phone:
- 07713 594983
- Email:
- fotwp@yahoo.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window