THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST AIDANS SOUTHCOATES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
St Aidan's is an Anglican Church in East Hull.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Kingston Upon Hull City
Governance
- 04 February 2014: Previously excepted registration
- ST AIDAN'S SOUTHCOATES PCC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV RICH PHILLIPS | Chair | 01 February 2014 |
|
|||||
NIGEL LENDON | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Huntridge | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Matthew Broom | Trustee | 16 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Susan Huntridge | Trustee | 16 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Esther Billington | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Michael Rablen | Trustee | 01 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dawn Isobel Rablen | Trustee | 29 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
DAVID MILNS | Trustee | 04 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN BILLINGTON | Trustee | 04 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
MR STEVE PICKERING | Trustee | 01 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL JAMES HILL | Trustee | 01 February 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £69.90k | £64.99k | £64.74k | £145.35k | £103.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £67.10k | £64.96k | £67.20k | £90.18k | £106.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 November 2024 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 15 November 2024 | 15 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 23 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 15 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 10 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 13 November 2020 | 13 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
139 Southcoates Avenue
HULL
HU9 3HF
- Phone:
- 01482704517
- Email:
- treasurer@staidans.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window