BINYAMIN MINISTRIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Binyamin Ministries holds a number of meetings, aiming to help with different aspects of people's needs. Other aspects of the work are street outreach; regular hospitality; one to one ministry; visiting the sick in hospital and their homes; driving people who need help to and from hospital appointments or other medical needs, and generally reaching out to the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
- 31 March 2014: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Martyn Cooper | Trustee | 17 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Justin Caplin | Trustee | 17 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Monica Jane Ursell | Trustee | 21 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
EILEEN BAEHR | Trustee | 21 January 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £86.53k | £132.52k | £105.25k | £81.76k | £48.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £84.20k | £128.55k | £103.13k | £79.31k | £41.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 06 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 22 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 09 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 10 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 31 Mar 2014
Charitable objects
(A)TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO ATTACHED MAINLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY AMONG JEWISH PEOPLE IN SUCH PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES ROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT; (B)TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS, GOODS, TRAINING OR SERVICES OF ANY KIND, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT IN SUCH PARTS OF LONDON, THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
50 BELLEVUE ROAD
LONDON
N11 3ER
- Phone:
- 07806768767
- Email:
- sam.media@mail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window