CHILD FUNERAL CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of funeral items and services for children of families in financial hardship in the UK
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 27 February 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 26 March 2014: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stacey Denton | Trustee | 15 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Professor Stephanie Pywell | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jill Maguire | Trustee | 14 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
MARY TOMES | Trustee | 08 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
KEVIN TOMES | Trustee | 08 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
ANNE BARBER | Trustee | 08 November 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 27/02/2020 | 27/02/2021 | 27/02/2022 | 27/02/2023 | 27/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.94k | £9.74k | £13.77k | £3.00k | £3.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.72k | £7.00k | £7.02k | £9.50k | £10.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 27 February 2024 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 27 February 2023 | 07 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 27 February 2022 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 27 February 2021 | 23 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 27 February 2020 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 01 OCT 2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 27/02/2014 as amended on 03 Jan 2025
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE FINANCIAL SUPPORT TO PARENTS WHO HAVE LOST A CHILD UNDER THE AGE OF 18, AND WHO ARE IN NEED OF SUCH FINANCIAL SUPPORT IN CONNECTION WITH FUNERAL AND ASSOCIATED COSTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Child Funeral Charity
Unit 1, The Shield Office Centre
Station Road
Kettering
Northampton
NN15 5NT
- Phone:
- 07973290887
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window