Financial history COMMUNITIES FIJI BRITAIN

Charity number: 1160206
Charity reporting is overdue by 483 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £161.53k £10.62k £16.93k £141.11k £107.18k
Total expenditure £30.36k £83.14k £69.74k £100.07k £68.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £131.10k N/A N/A N/A N/A