ROAD TO JANNAH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
- delivered safe water and improved health - ensured access to basic education and increased enrolment through Primary School renovations, school kits distribution and water filtration - assisted numerous orphans and vulnerable children -assisted hundreds of disabled and old aged people through wheelchair distribution -provided food and medical assistance
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Afghanistan
- Australia
- Bangladesh
- Egypt
- Ethiopia
- Fiji
- Ghana
- India
- Kenya
- Malawi
- Mali
- Nepal
- Nigeria
- Pakistan
- Rwanda
- Sierra Leone
- Somalia
- Sri Lanka
- Uganda
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 13 March 2014: Standard registration
- RTJ (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ABDUL SHAHEEM KHAN | Chair | 11 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
SALMA KHAN | Trustee | 11 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
ILYAS MEHTER | Trustee | 11 November 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £74.23k | £115.36k | £129.86k | £49.14k | £81.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £50.64k | £134.85k | £143.81k | £50.99k | £83.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 06 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 06 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 25 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 25 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 28 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 28 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 20 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 20 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 01 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 01 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 22 AUG 2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 17/02/2014
Charitable objects
PROVISION OF ASSISTANCE IN KIND OR CASH TO AFFECTED COMMUNITIES FOR SAVING LIVES IN AN EMERGENCY OR DISASTER IN THE WORLD THROUGH PARTNERSHIPS WITH CIVIL SOCIETY ORGANIZATIONS AND GOVERNMENT. EMPOWERING VULNERABLE COMMUNITIES WITH THE PROVISION OF HEALTH FACILITIES, ACCESS TO EDUCATION AND CAPACITY BUILDING. ENSURING BASIC RIGHTS OF VULNERABLE POPULATION THROUGH ACCESS TO SAFE WATER, MEDICAL FACILITIES AND SHELTERS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
32 SECOND AVENUE
LONDON
E13 8AS
- Phone:
- 02081445123
- Email:
- info@roadtojannah.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window