DUCHY PRESCHOOL AND PLAYGROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Nestled in the centre of Bradninch, The Duchy Preschool is at the heart of our community. As a non-profit organisation, we're proud of the service we provide to local families and the fun, nurturing, safe learning environment we offer our children. Parents can access our childcare in ways that fit in better with work.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income includes £2,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Devon
Governance
- 12 May 2014: CIO registration
- DUCHY PRESCHOOL AND PLAYGROUP BRADNINCH (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Porter | Chair | 16 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Alford | Trustee | 11 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Louise Heap | Trustee | 20 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Hannah Mears | Trustee | 19 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Ryding | Trustee | 08 February 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £99.99k | £106.23k | £114.20k | £138.33k | £158.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £75.83k | £102.79k | £120.21k | £145.73k | £146.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £64.76k | £569 | £69.59k | £102.93k | £2.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 07 July 2023 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 22 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 23 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 23 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 28 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 28 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 12 May 2014
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY WORKS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT HAVING AS ITS OBJECTS THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN PARTICULAR BY: 1) PROMOTING THEIR CARE AND SAFETY; 2) PROMOTING THEIR EDUCATION AND PROMOTING PARENTAL INVOLVEMENT; 3) PROMOTING THEIR HEALTH AND WELLBEING; 4) PROVIDING SERVICES TO SUPPORT THEM AND THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS; 5) PROVIDING SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS HOLDING MEMBERSHIP OF THE CIO; AND 6) FURTHERING THE AIMS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL LEARNING ALLIANCE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE DUCHY PRESCHOOL & PLAYGROUP
MILLWAY
BRADNINCH
EXETER
EX5 4NL
- Phone:
- 01392 881975
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window