Accounts and annual returns VIRGINIA WATER COMMUNITY PARTNERED LIBRARY LIMITED

Charity number: 1159258
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2024 20 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2023 06 December 2023 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2022 02 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2021 31 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2020 02 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Not Required