Trustees RED-AID
Charity number: 1157908

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Patricia Alessandra | Chair | 17 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Murphy | Trustee | 28 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Clare John | Trustee | 28 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Nancy Wright | Trustee | 06 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Doggett | Trustee | 28 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
CAROL BARNES | Trustee | 30 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
STACY HENNESSY | Trustee | 30 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
CATHERINE LLOYD | Trustee | 30 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
PETER JOSEPH KIELY | Trustee | 30 April 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.