SAQIB SIDDIQUE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1158754
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Helping socially and economically disadvantaged communities in the Kashmir (Pakistan) region.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 01 October 2023

Total income: £5,504
Total expenditure: £10,633

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Pakistan

Governance

Registration history:
  • 02 October 2014: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • AL FALAH FOUNDATION (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
FARRUKH SIDDIQUE Chair 03 January 2014
None on record
Mazar Zaman Trustee 03 January 2014
None on record
NAUREEN ISMAIL Trustee 03 January 2014
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/10/2019 01/10/2020 01/10/2021 01/10/2022 01/10/2023
Total gross income £16.61k £32.52k £16.33k £23.62k £5.50k
Total expenditure £11.69k £31.28k £14.54k £28.16k £10.63k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 October 2023 25 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 October 2023 Not Required
Annual return 01 October 2022 08 August 2023 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 October 2022 Not Required
Annual return 01 October 2021 09 August 2022 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 October 2021 Not Required
Annual return 01 October 2020 22 March 2022 233 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 October 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1371 days
Annual return 01 October 2019 30 December 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 October 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
11 QUEENS DRIVE
LONDON
E10 7HP
Phone:
07737979401
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available