THE LAKELAND CLIMBING FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of the public, including children, young people and adults, in the subject of climbing and walking.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Cumbria
Governance
- 03 January 2014: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JEREMY RICHARD WILSON | Chair | 11 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
Paul Cox | Trustee | 21 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
SARAH ELIZABETH WILSON | Trustee | 11 November 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £6 | £10 | £18 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.09k | £2.60k | £366 | £1.45k | £2.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 25 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 06 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 28 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 05 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 28/10/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 31/12/2013
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC,INCLUDING CHILDREN,YOUNG PEOPLE AND ADULTS,IN THE SUBJECT OF CLIMBING AND WALKING;(2)TO HELP AND EDUCATE CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PURSUIT OF WALKING AND CLIMBING ACTIVITIES SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL AND MENTAL CAPACITIES SO THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED.(3)TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR WALKING,CLIMBING AND OTHER OUTDOOR RECREATION OR LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR SUCH PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR POVERTY,SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES,ILLNESS OR DISABILITY WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Storrsthwaite
Storrs Park
Bowness-on-Windermere
Windermere
LA23 3LF
- Phone:
- 01539448221
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window