THE EXCHANGE CHURCH, AYLESBURY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The trust is established to: (a) to advance Christianity, in accordance with the provisions of the Basis of Faith of The Evangelical Alliance, in the county of Buckinghamshire and elsewhere; (b) to relieve people who are in charitable need; (c) to advance education (including vocational training); (d) to promote such other charitable objects as the Trustees shall from time to time determine.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 20 May 2014: Standard registration
- THE EXCHANGE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trevor John Bennett | Trustee | 06 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Fiona Annan | Trustee | 06 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Pyniarlang Shabong | Trustee | 16 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Speakman | Trustee | 29 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
SHARON JILL CLARK | Trustee | 21 January 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £55.47k | £58.21k | £52.40k | £52.75k | £57.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £66.58k | £43.00k | £44.99k | £51.45k | £63.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 30 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 30 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 23 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 23 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 07 NOV 2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 11/04/2014
Charitable objects
(A)TO ADVANCE CHRISTIANITY, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PROVISIONS OF THE BASIS OF FAITH OF THE EVANGELICAL ALLIANCE, IN THE COUNTY OF BUCKINGHAMSHIRE AND ELSEWHERE; (B) TO RELIEVE PEOPLE WHO ARE IN CHARITABLE NEED BECAUSE OF: (I)SICKNESS OR POOR HEALTH (II)AGE (III)FINANCIAL HARDSHIP (IV)OR SOME OTHER REASON BY ANY PROPER MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT AND INCLUDING (WHERE APPROPRIATE BUT NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION) THE PROVISION OF ADVICE; THE PROMOTION OF GOOD PRACTICES TO COMBAT SUCH CONDITIONS AND THE PROVISION OF RESOURCES TO ALLEVIATE OR PREVENT SUCH NEED. (C)TO ADVANCE EDUCATION (INCLUDING VOCATIONAL TRAINING); (D)TO PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE OBJECTS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
IN THE COUNTY OF BUCKINGHAMSHIRE AND ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 4
Chiltern House
Oxford Road
AYLESBURY
Buckinghamshire
HP19 8FQ
- Phone:
- 07833188084
- Email:
- info@exchange.uk.net
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window