The SDH Charitable Trust

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity is a grant making trust
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 18 December 2013: Standard registration
- THE SILVER CHARITABLE FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Foster | Trustee | 15 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Samuel De Haan | Trustee | 20 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jazmyn De Haan | Trustee | 20 February 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £47.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £2.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 01 October 2024 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 25 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 21 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 16 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 21/11/2013 as amended on 20 Mar 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO ADVANCE, PROMOTE OR CARRY OUT SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT. "CHARITABLE PURPOSES" MEANS PURPOSES WHICH ARE CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES
Contact information
- Address:
-
EIGHTH FLOOR
6 NEW STREET SQUARE
LONDON
- Phone:
- 02078422000
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window