THE RUBY CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1155059
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity is a grant making trust

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 December 2013: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Robert Edmondson Trustee 20 February 2023
CHARITY ESTABLISHED BY A TRUST DEED DATED 27 NOVEMBER 2013
Received: On time
Rebecca De Haan Trustee 20 February 2023
CHARITY ESTABLISHED BY A TRUST DEED DATED 27 NOVEMBER 2013
Received: On time
Ronak Amratia Trustee 20 February 2023
CHARITY ESTABLISHED BY A TRUST DEED DATED 27 NOVEMBER 2013
Received: On time
Naomi De Haan Trustee 20 February 2023
None on record

Financial history

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2019 30/11/2020 30/11/2021 30/11/2022 30/11/2023
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2023 30 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2022 11 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2021 21 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2020 14 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2019 16 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Strand House
Pilgrims Way
Monks Horton
ASHFORD
TN25 6DR
Phone:
01303813612
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available