CHELTENHAM HEBREW CONGREGATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The synagogue holds services every Friday night and and marks all festivals and high holidays. Many school visits take place to meet the national curriculum. A Jewish studies and Art/Music group meets regularly and there are various social activities. National Holocaust day is observed along with local council and other faith groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Gloucestershire
- Warwickshire
- Wiltshire
- Worcestershire
Governance
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JENNIFER MARILYNNE SILVERSTON | Chair | 08 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Susan Jane Hill | Trustee | 23 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Yass | Trustee | 23 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joel Nathan Huberman | Trustee | 18 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Shapiro | Trustee | 25 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
SARA CAPIE | Trustee | 08 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
ABIGAIL SARAH-JANE FISHER | Trustee | 08 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
STEVEN PAUL COHEN | Trustee | 08 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
ALLAN SANIS | Trustee | 08 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
DR ELIZABETH ROSE JACOBS | Trustee | 08 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE ANN DYER | Trustee | 08 January 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.69k | £20.47k | £23.12k | £15.70k | £23.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.43k | £40.11k | £19.69k | £10.01k | £16.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 03 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 03 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 13 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 13 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 01 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 01 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 01 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 01 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 28 Apr 2014 as amended on 19 Jun 2018 as amended on 25 Jun 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING:- TO FURTHER THE RELIGIOUS, EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CIO IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES AND PRINCIPLES OF JUDAISM AND TO MAINTAIN THE SYNAGOGUE AND CEMETERY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE SYNAGOGUE
SYNAGOGUE LANE
ST JAMES SQUARE
CHELTENHAM
GL50 3PU
- Phone:
- 01242242724
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window