UPLYME PRE-SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Uplyme Pre-school is a community based group that provides day care and pre-school education for children aged two to five, term time only. We are a registered charity, managed by a parent committee and governed by Ofsted.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income includes £74,397 from 1 government contract(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Devon
- Dorset
Governance
- 15 January 2014: CIO registration
- 29 April 2015: Funds received from 1026032 UPLYME PRESCHOOL
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charlotte Daubney | Chair | 29 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kate Pitfield | Trustee | 29 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Eleanor saunders | Trustee | 21 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sara Pearce | Trustee | 21 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Wason | Trustee | 30 October 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £59.72k | £58.34k | £77.08k | £80.22k | £95.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £52.39k | £59.57k | £73.16k | £84.27k | £89.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £49.65k | £57.46k | £66.32k | £60.39k | £74.40k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 26 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 26 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 21 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 21 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 07 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 07 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 15 Jan 2014
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY WORKS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT HAVING AS ITS OBJECTS THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN PARTICULAR BY: (1) PROMOTING THEIR CARE AND SAFETY; (2) PROMOTING THEIR EDUCATION AND PROMOTING PARENTAL INVOLVEMENT; (3) PROMOTING THEIR HEALTH AND WELLBEING; (4) PROVIDING SERVICES TO SUPPORT THEM AND THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS; (5) PROVIDING SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS HOLDING MEMBERSHIP OF THE CIO; AND (6) FURTHERING THE AIMS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL LEARNING ALLIANCE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
72 Beer Road
SEATON
Devon
EX12 2PR
- Phone:
- 07960088410
- Email:
- office@uplymepreschool.co.uk
- Website:
-
uplymepreschool.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window