SAMWORTH BROTHERS COMMUNITY OPPORTUNITY FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Criteria; We support projects in areas where Samworth Brothers is an integral & important part of the local community. We support clubs and organisations who promote community participation in healthy physical recreation of particular sports & in the education of healthy nutrition. Our main target group is young people under aged 18 years old from hard to reach and disadvantaged groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cornwall
- Devon
- Gloucestershire
- Leicester City
- Leicestershire
- Trafford
Governance
- 13 February 2014: Standard registration
- SAMWORTH BROTHERS SPORTS OPPORTUNITY FUND (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KAREN ELIZABETH HOLDSWORTH | Trustee | 10 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
PAULA ELAINE GAGIN | Trustee | 10 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jane Mary Nickerson MBE | Trustee | 13 December 2023 |
|
|||||
Sarah Elizabeth Topley | Trustee | 13 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jayesh Dave | Trustee | 13 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Morgan Alexander Ball | Trustee | 13 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Alexis Marris | Trustee | 13 December 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.72k | £0 | £250.19k | £216.31k | £223.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £95.37k | £76.79k | £114.66k | £68.67k | £122.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2023
(These accounts |
13 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 February 2021 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 12/08/2013 as amended on 14 Nov 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS ARE: 1) THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR PLAYING PARTICULAR SPORTS; 2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE WHETHER OR NOT THEY ARE UNDERGOING FORMAL EDUCATION; 3) TO IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE CLASSES OF PERSON SET OUT BELOW PROVIDING THEM WITH OPPORTUNITIES TO PARTICIPATE IN SPORTING ACTIVITIES AND EXPERIENCES: A) PEOPLE WITH A MENTAL OR PHYSICAL DISABILITY; B) PEOPLE WITH ANY FORM OF SENSORY IMPAIRMENT; AND C) PERSONS IN FINANCIAL NEED AND PERSONS WHO ARE OTHERWISE DISADVANTAGED.
Area of benefit
THROUGHOUT ENGLAND AND WALES
Contact information
- Address:
-
Samworth Bros (Holdings) Ltd
Chetwode House
1 Samworth Way
Melton Mowbray
LE13 1GA
- Phone:
- 01664414500
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window