THURLEIGH PRE SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Bedford
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 28 February 2014: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SHERIC RAFFERTY | Chair | 26 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
LISA GRIFFIN | Trustee | 26 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
Christine Hardwick | Trustee | 26 February 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 462 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 462 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 827 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 827 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1192 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1192 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1557 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1557 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 28 Feb 2014
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY WORKS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT HAVING AS ITS OBJECTIVES THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN PARTICULAR BY: 1) PROMOTING THEIR CARE AND SAFETY; 2) PROMOTING THEIR EDUCATION AND PROMOTING PARENTAL INVOLVEMENT; 3) PROMOTING THEIR HEALTH AND WELLBEING; 4) PROVIDING SERVICES TO SUPPORT THEM AND THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS; 5) PROVIDING SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS HOLDING MEMBERSHIP OF THE CIO; AND 6) FURTHERING THE AIMS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL LEARNING ALLIANCE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1a Hall Avenue
Rushden
NN10 9ES
- Phone:
- 07941697719
- Email:
- preschool@thurleigh.net
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window