BREATHE MINISTRIES LTD
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of Retreats and Support for Leaders in Christian Ministry
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2022
Total income includes £2,000 from 1 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 22 May 2014: Standard registration
- 15 May 2025: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2018 | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £60.86k | £72.14k | £29.25k | £48.16k | £38.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £81.08k | £73.89k | £55.93k | £55.55k | £41.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 16 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 16 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 381 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 381 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 11 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 11 March 2021 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 04 JUN 2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 28/04/2014
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH, IN PARTICULAR THROUGH OFFERING CHRISTIAN LEADERS TRAINING, SUPPORT AND MENTORING AT SPIRITUAL RETREATS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window