CHARR YARR WELFARE FOUNDATION LIMITED


Charity overview
Regulatory alerts
- The Charity Commission has published a report Open in new window on its inquiry into the charity
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity is involved in promoting education and the relief of poverty throughout the world but particularly in Pakistan by the establishment of centres of education and the promotion of self sustaining initiatives in impoverished areas,including but not exclusively those relating to farming,manufacturing and health projects .
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Bradford City
- Algeria
- Bangladesh
- India
- Morocco
- Pakistan
Governance
- 15 April 2014: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Iram Shaheen | Trustee | 28 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Johra Mashadi | Trustee | 28 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kiran Nissar | Trustee | 28 August 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £100.39k | £107.85k | £50.58k | £35.37k | £54.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £88.60k | £73.21k | £73.54k | £86.72k | £68.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 August 2023 | 61 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 30 August 2023 | 61 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 31 August 2022 | 62 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 31 August 2022 | 62 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 09 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 09 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 17 August 2020 | 48 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 August 2019
(These accounts |
17 August 2020 | 48 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12 AUG 2013
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF EDUCATION AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY THROUGHOUT THE WORLD BY THE ESTABLISHMENT OF CENTRES OF EDUCATION AND THE PROMOTION OF SELF-SUSTAINING INITIATIVES IN IMPOVERISHED AREAS, INCLUDING BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THOSE RELATED TO FARMING, MANUFACTURING AND HEALTH PROJECTS AND TO DO ALL SUCH ANCILLARY THINGS WHICH SUPPORT THE AFORE-MENTIONED OBJECTIVES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Cavell House
1-2 Eldon Terrace
BRADFORD
BD1 3AY
- Phone:
- 01274377724
- Email:
- azknem@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window