THE KESTLE BARTON TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Arranges artistic events and workshops and operates a gallery open to the general public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cornwall
Governance
- 17 April 2014: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TERESA ROSE SHEILA GLEADOWE | Trustee | 06 February 2014 |
|
|||||
MARK OSTERFIELD | Trustee | 06 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
ALISON BUNNING RIBA | Trustee | 06 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
KAREN SHEILA TOWNSHEND | Trustee | 06 February 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £128.73k | £107.30k | £127.08k | £84.76k | £95.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £141.07k | £92.03k | £114.19k | £112.99k | £99.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £40.00k | £45.33k | £12.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 February 2024 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 February 2024 | 22 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 25 OCT 2013
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: TO EDUCATE IN AND PROMOTE THE ARTS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND TO FURTHER THE DEVELOPMENT OF THE PUBLIC APPRECIATION OF THE ARTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
KESTLE BARTON
MANACCAN
HELSTON
TR12 6HU
- Phone:
- 02088914082
- Email:
- info@kestlebarton.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window