MISSION HUNGER
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
MISSION HUNGER IS A NON-PROFIT ORGANISATION. Mission Hunger thrives on responding to the hunger stricken people of many places worldwide.Our focus is purely on providing food,water,water filtration and whatever else it takes to abolish malnutrition on an on-going basis through our staff & volunteers in various countries worldwide. As our model is designed to be transparent & simple as possible.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Coventry City
- Bangladesh
- Burma
- India
- Indonesia
- Pakistan
Governance
- 20 December 2013: Standard registration
- 04 April 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.49k | £812 | £1.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.80k | £252 | £1.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 18 December 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 03 March 2017 | 31 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 16 June 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 07 SEP 2013
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS ARE THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN BY PROVIDING: GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window