BRIGHTON EXPLORERS CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Brighton Explorers Club is a multi-activity outdoors club. Activities include rock climbing, road cycling, mountain biking, walking, running, caving, kayaking, windsurfing, badminton, tennis, SUP, surfing. Certain activities happen weekly and across the year, whilst others are seasonal, with many taking place in the summer. We host local, national and international club trips.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Brighton And Hove
- East Sussex
- West Sussex
Governance
- 25 March 2014: CIO registration
- 12 May 2015: Funds received from 289639 THE BRIGHTON EXPLORERS CLUB
- BEC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tatti McNally | Chair | 14 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Mary Morfitt | Trustee | 23 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Thomas A R Gifford | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.13k | £43.31k | £20.63k | £14.99k | £14.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.34k | £15.17k | £15.13k | £30.88k | £18.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £21.75k | £5.21k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 May 2024 | 100 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 10 May 2024 | 100 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 25 Mar 2014
Charitable objects
2. OBJECTIVES: 2.1. THE OBJECT OF THE CLUB SHALL BE: 2.1.1 TO FACILITATE THE PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT AND GROWTH OF YOUNG PEOPLE BY EDUCATION AND INSTRUCTION THROUGH PARTICIPATION IN A WIDE VARIETY OF ACTIVITIES WITH SPECIAL REFERENCE TO THE OUTDOORS AND PHYSICAL ENDEAVOUR; AND 2.1.2 THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PARTICIPATION IN SPORTS SUCH AS CYCLING, CANOEING, WALKING, CAVING, CLIMBING, COASTEERING, WINDSURFING AND BADMINTON, BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION. 2.2. IN FURTHERANCE OF THE SAID OBJECT BUT NOT FURTHER OR OTHERWISE THE CLUB THROUGH ITS EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE SHALL HAVE THE FOLLOWING POWERS: 2.2.1. TO SUBSCRIBE OR AFFILIATE TO OR BECOME A MEMBER OF ANY OTHER INSTITUTIONS HAVING CHARITABLE OBJECTIVES SIMILAR TO THOSE OF THE CLUB OR PROVIDING ASSISTANCE OF ANY KIND TO THOSE PERSONS WHO WOULD BE QUALIFIED TO BE BENEFICIARIES OF THE CLUB; 2.2.2. TO RAISE FUNDS AND TO INVITE AND RECEIVE CONTRIBUTIONS FROM ANY PERSON OR PERSONS WHATSOEVER BY WAY OF SUBSCRIPTIONS AND OTHERWISE PROVIDED THAT THE CLUB SHALL NOT UNDERTAKE PERMANENT TRADING ACTIVITIES IN RAISING FUNDS FOR ITS OBJECTIVES; 2.2.3. TO DO ALL SUCH OTHER LAWFUL THINGS AS SHALL FURTHER THE OBJECTS OF THE CLUB.
Contact information
- Address:
-
108 King's Road Arches
Brighton
BN1 2FN
- Phone:
- 07900424091
- Email:
- chair@brightonexplorers.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window