Financial history BOXING4LIFE

Charity number: 1155607
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £19.84k £10.99k £10.54k £1.67k £488
Total expenditure £26.07k £7.91k £2.43k £6.23k £5.16k
Income from government contracts £1.20k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £6.77k N/A N/A N/A