Trustees CAMBRIDGE MUSEUM OF TECHNOLOGY
Charity Number: 1156685
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Wah Sung Vincent Mak | Trustee | 17 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Bhagwat Dilip Nagargoje | Trustee | 02 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Neil Sarkar | Trustee | 02 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amy Elizabeth Hooker | Trustee | 12 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kieran Thomas Gleave | Trustee | 10 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas George Plaister | Trustee | 08 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anne French | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Laura Carnicero | Trustee | 26 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Grace Thompson | Trustee | 26 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Steven Kruse | Trustee | 17 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Adrian Sheppard | Trustee | 30 November 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.