Financial history LLOYD GEORGE MUSEUM

Charity number: 504296
Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £75.29k £35.91k £61.69k £67.59k £225.26k
Total expenditure £75.29k £81.36k £61.69k £67.59k £225.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £29.76k £35.33k N/A £43.26k £208.34k