OAKHALL CHURCH, CATERHAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the CIO, for the public benefit, is the advancement of the Christian faith, in accordance with the Statement of Faith, in such parts of the United Kingdom and the world as the charity trustees may from time to time decide.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Surrey
- Serbia
Governance
- 07 March 2014: CIO registration
- 02 May 2014: Funds received from 252123 CHARITY OF ROBERT BEST IN CONNECTION WITH OAK HALL...
- OAKHALL CHURCH (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Charles Fenton Thompson | Trustee | 10 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
IAN WILLIAM MAYO | Trustee | 21 January 2014 |
|
|||||
DAVID PETER DOWNS | Trustee | 21 January 2014 |
|
|||||
Paul Duncan Bowker | Trustee | 21 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN MARK HARDY | Trustee | 21 January 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £481.73k | £595.38k | £642.17k | £623.82k | £430.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £442.55k | £533.80k | £526.02k | £569.95k | £457.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £556.33k | £584.07k | £505.42k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £0 | £16.03k | £74.60k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £2.15k | £28.16k | £43.79k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £36.91k | £13.91k | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | £80.00k | £13.09k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £533.80k | £526.02k | £569.95k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £4.44k | £5.02k | £6.25k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £282.78k | £236.80k | £242.16k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 14 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 07 Mar 2014
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH, IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE WORLD AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
181 CHALDON ROAD
CATERHAM
SURREY
CR3 5PL
- Phone:
- 01883 370264
- Email:
- office@oakhall.church
- Website:
-
oakhall.church
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window