Financial history RAFA KIDZONE LIMITED

Charity Number: 1154822
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £449.83k £670.95k £683.71k £897.92k £243.63k
Total expenditure £461.05k £617.19k £704.69k £839.87k £206.52k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £165.29k £129.51k £133.54k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £107.50k £18.05k £85.22k N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A £563.37k £665.66k £812.70k N/A
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A £78 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £617.19k £704.69k £839.87k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A £0 £10.15k £12.90k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A