Governance RAFA KIDZONE LIMITED
Charity Number: 1154822

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Registration history:
- 02 December 2013: Standard registration
- 12 November 2014: Funds received from 1081496 R.A.F. CRANWELL KIDZONE
- 14 May 2020: Funds received from 1069464 MAPLE LEAF DAYCARE
- 19 June 2023: Funds received from 1144714 SUNSHINE DAY NURSERY
- 25 March 2024: Funds received from 1069597 SERVICE FAMILIES CHILDCARE CHARITY
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
- RAF CRANWELL KIDZONE (Working name)
- KIDZONE CRANWELL LTD (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.