THE COLLECTIVE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To create opportunities for people to tackle the toughest challenges that cities face together.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
- 14 May 2014: CIO registration
- THE COLLECTIVE ELEVATOR (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MOHAMMAD REZA ASLAM MERCHANT | Chair | 10 December 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £100.00k | £100.00k | £278.94k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £98.06k | £103.92k | £202.09k | £0 | £132 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 94 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 94 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 460 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 460 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 May 2023 | 108 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 19 May 2023 | 108 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 July 2022 | 157 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 19 May 2023 | 473 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 14 May 2014
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP AN INDIVIDUAL’S CAPABILITIES, COMPETENCES, SKILLS AND UNDERSTANDING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
14 Bedford Square
Fitzrovia
London
WC1B 3JA
- Phone:
- 07596311659
- Email:
- merchant.reza@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.