Accounts and annual returns ASHBURY PRE SCHOOL PFSU

Charity number: 1156122
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2018 23 May 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 23 May 2019 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2017 18 October 2018 110 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 24 June 2018 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2016 24 June 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 24 June 2017 On Time