THE COMMUNITY YOUTH PROJECT (SOMERSET)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of youth work activities and services for local communities in Somerset for young people aged 8 and above.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £48,152 from 1 government contract(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Somerset
Governance
- 29 May 2014: CIO registration
- CYP (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kathryn Pearce | Trustee | 30 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
JUDITH HURLEY | Trustee | 19 December 2016 |
|
|||||
Jackie Joan Swabey | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
BARRIE THOMAS DAVIES | Trustee | 11 February 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £84.94k | £49.95k | £82.50k | £81.18k | £76.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £71.81k | £49.58k | £70.86k | £79.84k | £86.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £54.46k | £8.49k | £48.15k | N/A | £48.15k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | £48.15k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 17 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 12 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 15 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 29 May 2014
Charitable objects
TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF YOUNG PEOPLE UNDER 24 LIVING IN SOCIALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES IN SOMERSET SO THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY AND MEET THEIR NEEDS AND PARTICIPATE FULLY IN SOCIETY. TO DEVELOP YOUNG PEOPLE'S PHYSICAL, SOCIAL AND EMOTIONAL WELLBEING AND INCREASE THEIR SELF-CONFIDENCE SO THAT THEY MATURE INTO VALUABLE MEMBERS OF THEIR LOCAL COMMUNITY AND SOCIETY AS A WHOLE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Community Youth Project
The Market House
Church Street
MARTOCK
TA12 6JL
- Phone:
- 07887561145
- Email:
- jackie@cyp.me.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window