LINCOLNSHIRE COUNTY FEDERATION OF YOUNG FARMERS' CLUBS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN AGRICULTURE, HOMECRAFTS, COUNTRY LIFE AND RELATED SUBJECTS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £750 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 16 July 1975: Standard registration
- LINCOLNSHIRE Y F C (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Butler | Trustee | 29 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Jack Cullen | Trustee | 29 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Tom Barnett | Trustee | 29 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lorna Garrill | Trustee | 29 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rosie Finney | Trustee | 30 June 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £138.39k | £36.62k | £61.38k | £123.71k | £143.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £122.07k | £42.24k | £80.57k | £127.72k | £122.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £720 | N/A | £750 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2024
(These accounts |
31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2023
(These accounts |
30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 19 April 2022 | 78 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 March 2021 | 52 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 24 March 2021 | 52 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 APRIL 1974
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN AGRICULTURE, HOMECRAFTS, COUNTRY LIFE AND RELATED SUBJECTS: AND (B) IN THE INTERESTS OF THE SOCIAL WELFARE OF SUCH MEMBERS TO PROVIDE, AND PROMOTE THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATIONS, BEING FACILITIES WHICH WILL IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE AND WILL ASSIST IN THE DEVELOPMENT OF THEIR SPIRITUAL AND MENTAL CAPACITIES, SELF-RELIANCE AND INDIVIDUAL RESPONSIBILITY SO THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
YFC County Office
The Lincolnshire Showground
Lincoln
Lincolnshire
LN2 2NA
- Phone:
- 01522568989
- Email:
- kate.knight@lincsyfc.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window