YORKSHIRE FEDERATION OF YOUNG FARMERS' CLUBS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
youth organisation for people aged 10-26 years. Clubs arrange a weekly programme of events for their members including talks, visits and social activities. As well as weekly meetings members can also participate in sports, drama, quizzes, public speaking, community and conservation projects. Membership is open to anyone, whether they have an agricultural background or not
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
1679 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Barnsley
- Bradford City
- Calderdale
- City Of Wakefield
- Doncaster
- Kirklees
- Leeds City
- North Yorkshire
- Rotherham
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 05 June 1975: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jonathan Paul Gill | Trustee | 16 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andrew David Wood | Trustee | 16 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
DARREN COATES | Trustee | 27 April 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £95.24k | £86.01k | £74.32k | £78.30k | £89.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £103.54k | £42.16k | £48.18k | £63.19k | £95.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 03 January 2025 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 11 January 2023 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 11 January 2023 | 14 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 24 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 24 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 19 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 19 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 APRIL 1974
Charitable objects
A) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN AGRICULTURE, HOMECRAFTS, COUNTRY LIFE AND RELATED SUBJECTS AND B) IN THE INTERESTS OF THE SOCIAL WELFARE OF SUCH MEMBERS TO PROVIDE, AND PROMOTE THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURETIME OCCUPATIONS, BEING FACILITIES WHICH WILL IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE AND WILL ASSIST IN THE DEVELOPMENT OF THEIR SPIRITUAL AND MENTAL CAPACITIES SELF-RELIANCE AND INDIVIDUAL RESPONSIBILITY SO THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
NORTH, WEST AND SOUTH YORKSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Yorkshire Fed Of Young Farmers
Regional Agricultural Centre
Railway Road
HARROGATE
North Yorkshire
HG2 8NZ
- Phone:
- 01423 546170
- Email:
- office@yfyfc.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window