Trustees ANLABY PARK COMMUNITY LIBRARY
Charity number: 1155677
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Zoe Dalton | Trustee | 11 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Adam Farrah | Trustee | 11 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Josephine Wilkinson | Trustee | 11 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gill Meetoo | Trustee | 11 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
COUNCILLOR HAROLDO HERRERA-RICHMOND | Trustee | 07 February 2018 |
|
|||||
Gabrielle Bradford | Trustee | 15 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Mandy Abdulla | Trustee | 01 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
JOHN MICHAEL PALMER | Trustee | 16 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET CLARKE | Trustee | 16 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
PAULA SUDDARDS | Trustee | 16 December 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.