Accounts and annual returns BURTON JOYCE & DISTRICT U3A

Charity number: 1157213
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 26 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 26 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 10 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2022 13 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 12 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 12 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required