Financial history BURTON JOYCE & DISTRICT U3A

Charity number: 1157213
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £17.66k £6.74k £13.49k £18.67k £25.33k
Total expenditure £16.85k £5.18k £13.89k £19.70k £24.02k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A