MISSIONAL GENERATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Missional Generation visits Churches, Christian groups regularly along the M62 corridor to offer input and resources such as videos, devotions and other interactive sessions to inspire in their lives an understanding of scripture and how to be good citizens of hope within their communities. We are keen to cheer on local youth leaders and young people to live out the Christian faith.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Bradford City
- City Of Wakefield
- Kingston Upon Hull City
- Leeds City
- Liverpool City
- Manchester City
- Salford City
Governance
- 11 April 2014: CIO registration
- 07 May 2024: Funds received from 1169476 PRESENCE CHURCH (HARROGATE) UK
- MG (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Emma Wilkinson | Trustee | 06 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Alistair Gilfillan | Trustee | 12 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kim Lawrence | Trustee | 14 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Pecher | Trustee | 17 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Derek Jones | Trustee | 07 May 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £50.09k | £116.60k | £119.33k | £158.11k | £210.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £33.64k | £87.52k | £108.06k | £161.58k | £202.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 22 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 22 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2019 | 29 May 2020 | 114 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2019 | 29 May 2020 | 114 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 11 Apr 2014
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH THE TRAINING AND SUPPORT OF YOUNG PEOPLE AND YOUTH LEADERS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. LUKES VICARAGE
STANKS LANE NORTH
LEEDS
LS14 5AS
- Phone:
- 07815077836
- Email:
- Ben@missionalgen.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window