EALING EDUCATIONAL CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advance the education of pupils in the French education system in the UK in particular but without limitation by providing premises/facilities in the Ealing area offering a French/broader bilingual curriculum or providing assistance in establishing, maintaining, carrying on, managing, developing the school, ancillary educational/other charitable activities for the benefit of the community at large
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout London
Governance
- 24 January 2014: Standard registration
- 14 November 2019: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 14 November 2019: Funds transferred to 1153762 WEMBLEY EDUCATIONAL CHARITABLE TRUST
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £201.00k | £40.00k | £31.00k | £36.00k | £35.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.00k | £24.00k | £12.00k | £17.00k | £12.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 18 September 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | 18 September 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 23 August 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | 23 August 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 25 July 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | 25 July 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 28 October 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | 01 August 2016 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14/01/2014
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE FRENCH EDUCATION SYSTEM IN THE UNITED KINGDOM, IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION BY: (1) PROVIDING PREMISES AND FACILITIES IN THE EALING AREA OFFERING A FRENCH OR A BROADER BILINGUAL CURRICULUM OR PROVIDING ASSISTANCE IN ESTABLISHING, MAINTAINING, CARRYING ON, MANAGING AND DEVELOPING THE SCHOOL; (2) ANCILLARY EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY AT LARGE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window