Accounts and annual returns NORTH ILFORD COMMUNITY CENTRE LTD

Charity number: 1162811
Charity reporting is overdue by 254 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 254 days
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 254 days
Annual return 31 October 2022 14 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2021 21 September 2022 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2020 21 September 2022 386 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 21 September 2022 386 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2019 21 September 2022 751 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Not Required