Financial history LOCAL EPILEPTICS FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 504323
Charity reporting is up to date (37 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 09/11/2019 09/11/2020 09/11/2021 09/11/2022 09/11/2023
Total gross income £25.03k £25.62k £26.18k £21.35k £18.51k
Total expenditure £49.50k £14.85k £28.50k £8.84k £13.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.70k £12.45k N/A N/A